EP0816901 - Apparatus for setting a gap between glass substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 7-23, Meieki 4-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 7-23, Meieki 4-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | ||
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 7-23, 4-chome, Meieki, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Furukawa, Kyouji 28-8, Akashiro-cho 1-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Takagi, Shigeyuki 1-47 Kawaramachitouri Toyohashi-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | 03 /
Kondou, Takashi 137-2, Hashiarahachiban-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | [1998/04] |
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
Furukawa, Kyouji 28-8, Akashiro-cho 1-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | ||
02 /
Takagi, Shigeyuki 1-14 Kawaramachitouri Toyohashi-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | |||
03 /
Kondou, Takashi 137-2, Hashiarahachiban-cho Toyohashi-shi, Aichi Prefecture / JP | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110572.1 | 27.06.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | JP19960188802 | 28.06.1996 Original published format: JP 18880296 | JP19960215293 | 26.07.1996 Original published format: JP 21529396 | JP19970102539 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10253997 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0816901 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816901 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1339, B32B31/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B32B37/1054 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/1018 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1339 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/38] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Einstellung des Abstandes zwischen Glassubstraten | [1998/02] | English: | Apparatus for setting a gap between glass substrates | [1998/02] | French: | Dispositif pour ajuster l'écartement entre des substrats en verre | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/29] | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.06.2002 | [2004/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPS5957221 ; | [X]EP0066136 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-12 * page 32, line 5 - page 33, line 22; figure 8; example 24 *; | [X]US4923552 (FUKUSHIMA TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-12 * figures 1C,3,5,7 * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840724), vol. 008, no. 159, Database accession no. (P - 289), & JP59057221 A 19840402 (ASAHI GLASS KK) [DX] 1-7,9-12 * abstract * |