EP0816159 - Infant seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strojny, Pawel Nadistrasse 10/1 80809 München / DE | [1998/02] | Application number, filing date | 97110691.9 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996126641 | 02.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19626641 | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816159 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816159 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816159 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B60N2/2863 (EP,US);
B60N2/2824 (EP,US);
B60N2/286 (EP,US);
B60N2/2875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/20] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kindersitz | [1998/02] | English: | Infant seat | [1998/02] | French: | Siège d'enfants | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3634501 (GERBER PROD [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE9203620U (CURT WÜRSTL VERMÖGENSVERWALTUNGS GMBH & CO. KG); | [AD]DE4006030 (SPALDING & EVENFLO [US]) | Examination | EP0447097 |