Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9901097 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9901096 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9901095 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9901094 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828024 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828023 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828022 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828021 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828020 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828019 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828018 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828017 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828016 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828015 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9828014 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827918 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827917 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827916 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110733 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827915 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827914 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827913 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827912 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827911 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827910 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9827909 | Global Dossier | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010001293 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009149844 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509405 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509404 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001509403 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001508329 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723837 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4279355B | Global Dossier | 17.06.2009 | B2 | JP2001508094 | 19.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723474 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001508053 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723473 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001507962 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | US9723471 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001507728 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723460 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001507591 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9723834 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001506532 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801006 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000510027 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | US9723453 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505713 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723836 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505709 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723478 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505708 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723477 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505707 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723476 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110733 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505706 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723475 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505705 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723472 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505704 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723464 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505703 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9723458 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505702 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723457 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505701 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723456 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505700 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723455 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505699 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | US9723454 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505698 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723452 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000505697 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1023019 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9723458 | 22.12.1997 | EP97952541 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1006975 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97953316 | 22.12.1997 | US9723453 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1006974 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | EP97953315 | 22.12.1997 | US9723452 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1006973 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP97953314 | 22.12.1997 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1006972 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | EP97952547 | 22.12.1997 | US9723477 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1006971 | Global Dossier | 14.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97952546 | 22.12.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723476 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110733 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0993290 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98925894 | 29.06.1998 | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0993289 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98925893 | 29.06.1998 | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0993288 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98925892 | 29.06.1998 | IB9801006 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0991387 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP98925895 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0968007 | Global Dossier | 02.05.2007 | B1 | EP0968007 | 05.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97952544 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723474 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0967952 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | EP97952545 | 22.12.1997 | US9723475 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0961606 | Global Dossier | 08.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP97952539 | 22.12.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723455 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0961605 | Global Dossier | 08.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP97952538 | 22.12.1997 | US9723454 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0957871 | Global Dossier | 24.11.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97951759 | 22.12.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723478 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948369 | Global Dossier | 13.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97954169 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723472 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948368 | Global Dossier | 13.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97954168 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | US9723471 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948367 | Global Dossier | 13.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97953322 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723473 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948366 | Global Dossier | 13.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723460 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | EP97953317 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948365 | Global Dossier | 13.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97952540 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723456 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0948364 | Global Dossier | 13.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97950989 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723457 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0946215 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97952630 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723837 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0946214 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723836 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | EP97952629 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0946213 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9723834 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | EP97952628 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0946212 | Global Dossier | 06.10.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP97951756 | 22.12.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723464 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0888765 | Global Dossier | 07.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0888763 | Global Dossier | 07.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0888762 | Global Dossier | 07.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0855190 | Global Dossier | 29.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0853934 | Global Dossier | 22.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0852149 | Global Dossier | 08.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850649 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850628 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850627 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110733 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850626 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850624 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7785198 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7785098 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7784998 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801006 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU738092B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2001 | B2 | AU7785298 | 25.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5801598 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723472 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5801498 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | US9723471 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU736837B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2001 | B2 | AU5709498 | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723473 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5709198 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723460 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5709098 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | US9723453 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5708998 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723452 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5708898 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5619798 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723837 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5619698 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723836 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5619598 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9723834 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5613298 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723477 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5613198 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723476 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110733 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5613098 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723475 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU748755B | Global Dossier | 13.06.2002 | B2 | AU5612998 | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723474 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU738008B | Global Dossier | 06.09.2001 | B2 | AU5612698 | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US9723458 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU748792B | Global Dossier | 13.06.2002 | B2 | AU5612598 | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723456 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5612498 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723455 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5612398 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | US9723454 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5531598 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723478 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5531398 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723464 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5385398 | Global Dossier | 17.07.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723457 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850625 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR010858 | 12.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | EP96012741 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR010859 | 12.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR016124 | 20.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR016300 | 04.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR016301 | 04.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE361106T | 15.05.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9713599 | 04.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723455 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714835 | 03.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723464 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714836 | 03.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723452 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714837 | 03.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | US9723453 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714841 | 01.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | US9723454 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714843 | 03.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723478 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9714844 | 17.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723475 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9715018 | 06.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723836 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9715023 | 06.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9810528 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9810533 | 12.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9810534 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801006 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9810662 | 29.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275285 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275575 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723452 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275752 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723837 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275754 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | US9723454 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275759 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US9723460 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275765 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723476 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110733 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275772 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9723834 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275881 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | US9723475 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275882 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | US9723455 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275883 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723464 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275895 | 07.10.2003 | C | CA2275895 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9723458 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275897 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | US9723453 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275898 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723457 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275900 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723477 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275918 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723836 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275924 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723478 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275990 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | US9723471 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275991 | 04.01.2005 | C | CA2275991 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723473 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2275992 | 04.01.2005 | C | CA2275992 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723474 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2276040 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | US9723472 | 22.12.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2276060 | 04.01.2005 | C | CA2276060 | 02.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723456 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2295730 | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2295737 | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801006 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2295742 | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2295745 | 14.01.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1154515C | 23.06.2004 | C | CN1246061 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1154516C | 23.06.2004 | C | CN1246062 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1154517C | 23.06.2004 | C | CN1246065 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246044 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246060 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246063 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246064 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246066 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246067 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1246068 | 01.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1268038 | 27.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1268041 | 27.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1268042 | 27.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1268043 | 27.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO4900015 | 27.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO4910107 | 24.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5060493 | 30.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO5060494 | 30.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69737695T | 10.01.2008 | T2 | DE69737695D1 | 14.06.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723474 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG21371 | 30.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG21506 | 28.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG21512 | 28.11.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2286837T | 01.12.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0000830 | 28.09.2000 | A3 | HUP0000830 | 28.08.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0002647 | 29.01.2001 | A3 | HUP0002647 | 28.12.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0002786 | 28.02.2003 | A3 | HUP0002786 | 29.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0003531 | 28.03.2001 | A3 | HUP0003531 | 28.02.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP0004466 | 28.05.2001 | A3 | HUP0004466 | 28.04.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID23036A | 06.01.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID23798A | 11.05.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID27461A | 12.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID27867A | 26.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID28108A | 03.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100402571B | 22.10.2003 | B1 | KR20000069660 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100402572B | 22.10.2003 | B1 | KR20000069676 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100402632B | 22.10.2003 | B1 | KR20000069670 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069636 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069641 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069655 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069657 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069659 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069661 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110732 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069662 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069663 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069665 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069666 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069667 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069668 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069672 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069674 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069675 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069677 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20000069690 | 25.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010014399 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010014402 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97113802 | 09.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010014429 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010014435 | 26.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO993054L | 23.08.1999 | L | NO993054D0 | 21.06.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO993060L | 23.08.1999 | L | NO993060D0 | 21.06.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723478 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO996583L | 28.02.2000 | L | NO996583D0 | 30.12.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO996584L | 28.02.2000 | L | NO996584D0 | 30.12.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO996585L | 28.02.2000 | L | NO996585D0 | 30.12.1999 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | IB9801009 | 29.06.1998 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE102099 | 08.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE102199 | 10.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE102299 | 10.12.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE25499 | 31.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE33799 | 19.04.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL337726 | 28.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL337727 | 28.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK186999 | 12.09.2000 | A3 | Priority number | Date | IB9801007 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK189399A3 | 09.10.2000 | A3 | Priority number | Date | IB9801008 | 29.06.1998 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199901440T | 23.08.1999 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199903320T | 21.09.2000 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199903321T | 21.09.2000 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200000306T | 21.08.2000 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | EP97122739 | 23.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW496734B | 01.08.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6156818 | 05.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | EP97110731 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | US9723477 | 22.12.1997 | US33165899 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6177482 | 23.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US33168599 | 23.06.1999 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723474 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6187989 | 13.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | US9723453 | 22.12.1997 | US33174399 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6191189 | 20.02.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9723458 | 22.12.1997 | EP97120338 | 20.11.1997 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US33174199 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6211263 | 03.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120336 | 20.11.1997 | US33169499 | 23.06.1999 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | US9723473 | 22.12.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6316524 | 13.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP97110727 | 01.07.1997 | US33168899 | 23.06.1999 | US9723451 | 22.12.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6365645 | 02.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP97120337 | 20.11.1997 | US9723471 | 22.12.1997 | US33166099 | 23.06.1999 | EP97110730 | 01.07.1997 | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6369126 | 09.04.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9723460 | 22.12.1997 | US33168699 | 23.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA985729 | 06.01.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA985730 | 06.01.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97110734 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA985731 | 06.01.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA985732 | 19.01.1999 | B | Priority number | Date | EP97110735 | 01.07.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850623 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850622 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850621 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850620 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850619 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850618 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR199901438T | 23.08.1999 | T2 | Priority number | Date | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711595 | 22.09.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120738 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711596 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711597 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711598 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711599 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120737 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711601 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120742 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711605 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120741 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711608 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120740 | 23.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA9711609 | 25.06.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | EP96120739 | 23.12.1996 |