Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH1067768 | Global Dossier | 10.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0816353 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2001 | B1 | EP0816353 | 04.03.1998 | A3 | EP0816353 | 07.01.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE211136T | 15.01.2002 | T1 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BA97239A | 06.11.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG63045B | 28.02.2001 | B1 | BG101722 | 31.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2209404 | 02.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1170722 | 21.01.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ207397 | 14.01.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69709252T | 25.07.2002 | T2 | DE69709252D1 | 31.01.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP960308 | 31.08.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUP9701134 | 28.02.2001 | A3 | HUP9701134 | 28.12.1998 | A2 | HU9701134D0 | 28.08.1997 | D0 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL320912 | 05.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT816353E | 31.05.2002 | E | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2135490 | 27.08.1999 | C1 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI9700176 | 28.02.2002 | B | SI9700176 | 28.02.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK282106B | 06.11.2001 | B6 | SK87597 | 04.02.1998 | A3 | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5840922 | 24.11.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | HRP960308 | 02.07.1996 |