EP0816353 - New coumarin derivatives, processes for the preparation thereof and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLIVA farmaceutska, kemijska, prehrambena i kozmeticka industrija, dionicko drustvo Ulica grada Vukovara 49 41000 Zagreb / HR | [2001/51] |
Former [1998/02] | For all designated states PLIVA farmaceutska, kemijska, prehrambena i kozmeticka industrija dionicko drustvo Ulica grada Vukovara 49 10000 Zagreb / HR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trkovnik, Mladen Koprivnicka 56a 10000 Zagreb / HR | 02 /
Ivezic, Zrinka Milovana Gavazzia 2a 10000 Zagreb / HR | 03 /
Polak, Ljerka Ljubljanica 28 10000 Zagreb / HR | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110824.6 | 01.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | HR19960000308 | 02.07.1996 Original published format: HR 960308 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816353 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816353 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816353 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D311/16 | [1998/02] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1998/47] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | RO | 01.07.1997 | Title | German: | Coumarin-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [1998/02] | English: | New coumarin derivatives, processes for the preparation thereof and their use | [1998/02] | French: | Dérivés de coumarine, procédés pour leur préparation et leur usage | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 08.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.12.2001 | IT | 19.12.2001 | NL | 19.12.2001 | SE | 19.03.2002 | ES | 27.06.2002 | AT | 01.07.2002 | GB | 01.07.2002 | PT | 01.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/07] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
IT | 19.12.2001 | ||
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 01.07.2002 | ||
GB | 01.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 01.07.2002 | ||
GB | 01.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2002 | ||
AT | 01.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/03] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
AT | 01.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 19.12.2001 | |
NL | 19.12.2001 | ||
SE | 19.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/27] | SE | 19.03.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3313818 (LESHER GEORGE Y) [X] 1 * column 1 - column 7 *; | [A]US4210758 (CONNOR DAVID T [US]) [A] 1,7* column 4 - column 5 * | Examination | EP0820998 |