EP0819416 - Device for lowering and lifting a handicapped person [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RMT Lift & Transfer GmbH Waldstrasse 23/A9 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [1998/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sander, Wolfgang Am Mühlberg 3 61197 Florstadt / DE | 02 /
Resch, Bernhard Keltenring 14 63128 Dietzenbach / DE | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Linser, Heinz Patentanwalt Fichtestrasse 8 16548 Glienicke/Nordb. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Linser, Heinz Patentanwalt Fichtestrasse 8 16548 Glienicke/Nordb. / DE | Application number, filing date | 97110921.0 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | DE1996128903 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628903 | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819416 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819416 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819416 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/10 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
A61G7/1005 (EP);
A61G7/1017 (EP);
A61G7/1044 (EP);
A61G7/1046 (EP);
A61G7/1053 (EP);
A61G7/1059 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Absenken und Heben einer behinderten Person | [1998/04] | English: | Device for lowering and lifting a handicapped person | [1998/04] | French: | Dispositif pour abaisser et lever une personne handicapée | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/33] | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.10.2003 | IE | 08.10.2003 | GR | 08.01.2004 | ES | 19.01.2004 | PT | 08.03.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/46] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
IE | 08.10.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
ES | 19.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
IE | 08.10.2003 | ||
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 08.10.2003 | |
GR | 08.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 08.10.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1804299 (YENTSCH WILLIAM C) [A] 13 * page 1, line 75 - line 83 * * page 1, line 90 - page 2, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2891256 (VINCENT SCULLY) [A] 11 * column 2, line 52 - line 54 *; | [X]DE1210125 (JOHANNES PETRUS BAKKER) [X] 1,2,4,14 * column 3, line 35 - line 41 * * column 4, line 9 - line 12 * * column 4, line 39 - line 48; figure 1 *; | [A]US4003479 (REYER WILLIAM J) [A] 8,9 * column 3, line 26 - line 47; figure 2 *; | [X]FR2414909 (JOUK LEO [FR]) [X] 1,4,12 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2546497 (ANNECY JEUNE CHAMBRE ECONOMIQU [FR]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 37 - page 3, line 31; figure 2 *; | [A]GB2154201 (JAMES IND LTD) [A] 4,6,8,10,12 * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 5 * * page 3, line 17 - line 30; figures 1,4,5 *; | [X]FR2657251 (CROIX VERINE LYCEE PROFESSIONN [FR]) [X] 1,2,4-6,13 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE29500755U (SANDER WOLFGANG [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2713084 (SAMERY INT SA [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4417256 (EWS REHA TECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | DE295007559U | DE4417256 |