EP0816173 - Recording device for a vehicle,with a drawer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2002 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burkart, Harald, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Sturmbühlstrasse 170 78054 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1998/02] | Application number, filing date | 97110981.4 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | DE1996211853U | 06.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29611853 U | [1998/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816173 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816173 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816173 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, G07C7/00, G01P1/12, H05K5/00 | [2001/45] | CPC: |
B60R11/00 (EP);
B60R11/02 (EP);
G01P1/125 (EP);
G07C7/00 (EP);
B60R2011/0045 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/52] | B60R11/02, G07C7/00, G01P1/06, H05K5/00 | ||
Former IPC [1998/02] | B60R11/02, G07C7/00, G01P1/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/36] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug-Registriergerät mit einer Schublade | [1998/02] | English: | Recording device for a vehicle,with a drawer | [1998/02] | French: | Appareil enregistreur pour véhicule avec tiroir | [1998/02] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.10.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0709683 (MANNESMANN KIENZLE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 7 *; | [A]US4732430 (BYRNS JAMES E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 24 * * column 2, line 58 - line 64 *; | [A]US5199777 (TAIMA HAJIME [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 10 *; | [A]US5211461 (TEUFEL RAINER B [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 8, line 11 - line 54 *; | [A]DE2342426 (INGHAM & CO LTD R E); | [A]FR2718282 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al) |