EP0823510 - Collapsable guide sign [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kosan Co., Ltd. 8-14, Wakamiya 1-chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states Dai-Ichi Kosan Co., Ltd. 8-14, Wakamiya 1-chome Ichikawa-shi, Chiba / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Fumio 25-4, Shimomaruko 2-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Takashi 25-4, Shimomaruko 2-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Tsutomu 25-4, Shimomaruko 2-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [1998/07] | Patentanwälte Lippert, Stachow, Schmidt & Partner Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111100.0 | 03.07.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | JP19960178270 | 08.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17827096 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823510 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/012 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
E01F9/608 (KR);
E01F9/619 (KR);
E01F9/646 (KR);
E01F9/654 (EP,KR);
E01F9/688 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusammenlegbares Warnzeichen | [1998/07] | English: | Collapsable guide sign | [1998/07] | French: | Dispositif de signalisation pliable | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/35] | 31.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |