EP0820905 - Knee-bolster device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2002 [2002/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | [1998/24] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states TRW Occupant Restraint Systems GmbH Industriestrasse 20 73551 Alfdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heilig, Alexander Uhlandstrasse 17 73550 Wissgoldingen / DE | 02 /
Bigi, Dante, Dr. Keuperweg 12 73557 Mutlangen / DE | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Kitzhofer, Thomas, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Kitzhofer, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111296.6 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | DE1996213045U | 26.07.1996 Original published format: DE 29613045 U | [1998/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820905 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820905 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
B60R21/206 (EP,US);
B60R2021/21531 (EP,US);
B60R2021/23169 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/41] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Knieschutzeinrichtung | [1998/05] | English: | Knee-bolster device | [1998/05] | French: | Dispositif protège-genoux | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2063478 (DE2063478) [X] 1,7 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3 * [Y] 10; | [PY]JPH09109813 ; | [XA]US5458366 (HOCK CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * figure - * * column 1, line 5 - line 9 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 55 * [A] 6,8,9; | [PX]WO9709207 (VOLVO AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1,7 * figure - * * claims 1-14 *; | [A]DE2153601 (ROCKET RESEARCH CORP.) [A] 1,4,5,7 * figure - * * page 3, line 32 - page 5, line 24 * | [XA] - "INFLATABLE BELLOWS-BOX PANEL", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19950601), no. 374, page 371, XP000519424 [X] 1,3,7 [A] 2,6,8,9 | [PY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 097, no. 008, & JP09109813 A 19970428 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [PY] 10 * abstract * |