Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3032733B | Global Dossier | 17.04.2000 | B2 | JPH1068263 | 10.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE29612684 | 22.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0821125 | Global Dossier | 28.01.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE29612684 | 22.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9704049 | 22.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | DE29612684 | 22.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29612684U | 19.09.1996 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE29612684 | 22.07.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6134750 | 24.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | DE29612684 | 22.07.1996 |