EP0818870 - Reluctance motor having magnetic poles formed by laminating steel plates in circumferential direction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawabata, Yasutomo c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Miura, Tetsuya c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Hirako, Masaru c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97111479.8 | 07.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | JP19960177856 | 08.07.1996 Original published format: JP 17785696 | JP19960318908 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31890896 | [1998/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818870 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818870 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/08, H02K1/24, H02K1/02, H02K19/10 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
H02K1/08 (EP,US);
H02K1/246 (EP,US);
H02K1/276 (EP,US);
H02K21/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1998/39] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Reluktanzmotor mit Magnetpole, die aus in der Umfangsrichtung angeordneten Blechpakete bestehen | [1998/03] | English: | Reluctance motor having magnetic poles formed by laminating steel plates in circumferential direction | [1998/03] | French: | Moteur à reluctance ayant des poles magnétiques formés par des empilements de toles en acier selon la direction circonférentielle | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/03] | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9114875 (NOVA CORP OF ALBERTA [CA]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 1; figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 4 *; | [X]US4110646 (RAO S CHANDRASEKHARA) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 39 - line 45; figure 1; claim 2 *; | [X]GB1114562 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,5 * page 1, line 51 - line 70; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 3, line 94 - line 97 *; | [XA]US3671789 (MENZIES ROBERT W) [X] 1 * column 4, line 21 - line 36; figure 1 * [A] 2; | [X]US5296773 (EL-ANTABLY AHMED M [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 35 - line 50; figure 2 * * column 3, line 28 - line 29 *; | [A]JPH03155347 ; | [A]US4249099 (BHONGBHIBHAT WISNU, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 *; | [A]US3591819 (LAING NIKOLAUS) [A] 1,2 * figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910930), vol. 015, no. 387, Database accession no. (E - 1117), & JP03155347 A 19910703 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 3,4 * abstract * |