EP0802108 - Motor truck having a cab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AITO SYOJI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-16, 2-chome, Nakata, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states AITO SYOJI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 11-16, 2-chome, Nakata, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Gengo c/o Aito Syoji K. K., 11-16, 2-chome, Nakata Chikusa-ku, Nagoya-Shi, Aichi-Ken / JP | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 97111627.2 | 03.09.1993 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | JP19920072997U | 25.09.1992 Original published format: JP 7299792 U | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0802108 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802108 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
B60K15/063 (EP);
B60K5/00 (EP);
B62D33/06 (EP);
B60K2015/0638 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/43] | Title | German: | Fahrerhaus für einen Lastkraftwagen | [1997/43] | English: | Motor truck having a cab | [1997/43] | French: | Camion ayant une cabine | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/43] | 03.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93306993.2 / EP0589584 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2490162 (RUELLE) [X] 1,5,6 * column 1, line 42 - line 55; figures 1-3 *; | [YX]DE807897 (RUELLE) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * [X] 4-6; | [Y]DE1966196 (HITACHI) [Y] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE1943604 (HITACHI); | [A]FR2100383 (INT HARVESTER) |