EP0819915 - Device for filtering harmonic signal components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2002/41] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holzapfel, Wolfgang, Dr. Grottenweg 2 83119 Obing / DE | [1998/04] | Application number, filing date | 97111634.8 | 09.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | DE1996128602 | 16.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628602 | [1998/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819915 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819915 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/36 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
G01D5/366 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Filterung von Oberwellen-Signalanteilen | [1998/04] | English: | Device for filtering harmonic signal components | [1998/04] | French: | Dispositif de filtrage des composants harmoniques d'un signal | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0541828 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0714015 (MITUTOYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * |