EP0819500 - Automatic measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Speedfam Co., Ltd. 30-3, Nishirokugou 4-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states Speedfam Co., Ltd. 30-3, Nishirokugou 4-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurita, Tamotsu Hayakawa 2647 Ayase-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Nagai, Manabu Hayakawa 2647 Ayase-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | von Fischern, Bernhard, et al Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | von Fischern, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann - Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112153.8 | 16.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | JP19960206391 | 18.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20639196 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819500 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819500 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B24B37/04 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
B24B37/04 (KR);
B24B37/08 (EP,US);
G01B7/02 (KR);
G01B7/10 (EP,US);
G01B7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatisches Messgerät | [1998/04] | English: | Automatic measuring apparatus | [1998/04] | French: | Appareil automatique de mesure | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 16.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.12.2001 | IT | 05.12.2001 | GB | 16.07.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 05.12.2001 | |
GB | 16.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | GB | 16.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3213252 (SHINETSU ENG CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * [A] 2-7; | [A]US4407094 (BENNETT EMERIC S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column 4, line 18 - column 5, line 2; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]JPH03234468 ; | [A]JPS58192747 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920116), vol. 16, no. 16, Database accession no. (M - 1200), & JP03234468 A 19911018 (CANON INC) [A] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840215), vol. 8, no. 35, Database accession no. (M - 276), & JP58192747 A 19831110 (SUMITOMO TOKUSHIYU KINZOKU KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |