EP0807966 - Heat treatment method for semiconductor substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOSHIBA MICRO-ELECTRONICS CORPORATION 25-1, Ekimaehoncho Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samata, Shuichi 615-1-161, Noba-cho, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Fukui, Hiroyuki 202, Prism Betsumei, 5-2-10 Betsumei Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | 03 /
INOUE, Yoko, C/O Intellectual Property Div. K.K.Toshiba, 580-1 Horikawa-Cho, Saiwai-Ku Kawasaki-Shi, Kanagawa-Ken / JP | [1998/26] |
Former [1998/20] | 01 /
Samata, Shuichi 615-1-161, Noba-cho, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Fukui, Hiroyuki 202, Prism Betsumei, 5-2-10 Betsumei Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | |||
03 /
INOUE, Yoko 1117, Myrtle Drive Sunnyvale, CA94086 / US | |||
Former [1998/18] | 01 /
Samata, Shuichi 615-1-161, Noba-cho, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Fukui, Hiroyuki 202, Prism Betsumei, 5-2-10 Betsumei Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inoue, Yoko 1117 Myrtle Drive Sunnyvale CA 94086 / US | |||
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
Samata, Shuichi 615-1-161, Noba-cho, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Fukui, Hiroyuki 202, Prism Betsumei, 5-2-10 Betsumei Yokkaichi-Shi Mie-Ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inoue, Yoko 1-7-29-509, Wada, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
Former [1997/47] | 01 /
Samata, Shuichi 615-1-161, Noba-cho, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Fukui, Hiroyuki 702, Paredoru Minaharu, 622-1, Ooaza Minaharu Ooita-shi, Ooita-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Inoue, Yoko 1-7-29-509, Wada, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/47] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112237.9 | 10.06.1994 | [1997/47] | Priority number, date | JP19930138536 | 10.06.1993 Original published format: JP 13853693 | [1997/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0807966 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/316, H01L21/306 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
H01L21/28185 (EP);
H01L21/3225 (EP);
H01L21/324 (KR);
H01L21/67109 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/47] | Title | German: | Wärmebehandlungsmethode für Halbleiterscheiben | [1997/47] | English: | Heat treatment method for semiconductor substrate | [1997/47] | French: | Procédé de traitement thermique pour substrats semi-conducteurs | [1997/47] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/47] | 19.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/27] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94108961.7 / EP0628994 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0316835 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * column W *; | [X]US3855024 (LIM M) [X] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [PA]US5264396 (THAKUR RANDHIR P S [US], et al) [PA] 1-7 * column W *; | [A]US4149905 (LEVINSTEIN HYMAN J, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - A.ISHIZAKA ET AL., "Low Temperature Surface Cleaning of Silicon and its Application to Silicon MBE", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US, (198604), vol. 133, no. 4, pages 666 - 671, XP000568895 [A] 1 * page 667, column L, paragraph L * | [A] - YASUO KUNII ET AL., "Si Surface Cleaning by Si2H6-H2 Gas Etching and its Effects on Solid-Pase Epitaxy", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, TOKYO JP, (198711), vol. 26, no. 11, pages 1816 - 1822, XP002040473 [A] 1 * page 1816, column L, paragraph 2; figure 2A * |