EP0820112 - Enclosed lead storage battery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Akihiro 5839-12-B102, Shinjo Kosai-shi / JP | 02 /
Kashio, Gou 76-2-B Sawatari Oiwacho, Toyohashi-shi / JP | 03 /
Hiramatsu, Akitoshi 39, Miyoshi Goyucho, Toyokawa-shi / JP | 04 /
Hattori, Takashi 68-307, Yamada Nibancho Toyohashi-shi / JP | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/04] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112303.9 | 17.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | JP19960187158 | 17.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18715896 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0820112 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0820112 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820112 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/12, H01M10/16 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
H01M10/0413 (EP,US);
H01M10/0468 (EP,US);
H01M10/12 (EP,US);
H01M10/16 (EP,US);
H01M4/72 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/04] | H01M10/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/46] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verschlossener Bleiakkumulator | [1998/04] | English: | Enclosed lead storage battery | [1998/04] | French: | Accumulateur étanche au plomb | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6081776 ; | [A]JPS62150649 ; | [A]JPS63102172 ; | [A]GB540491 (WALTER ARTHUR MELSOM, et al) [A] 1,2 * page 1, column L, line 8 - line 20 * * page 1, column R, line 60 - line 64 * * page 2, column L, line 3 - line 9 * * page 4, column L, line 53 - line 59 * * page 4, column R, line 101 - line 125 * * figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO8101076 (CHLORIDE GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 2 - line 6 * * page 2, line 18 - line 20 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 2 * * page 7, line 29 - page 8, line 3 ** page 8, line 10 - line 15 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850911), vol. 009, no. 225, Database accession no. (E - 342), & JP60081776 A 19850509 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871215), vol. 011, no. 384, Database accession no. (E - 565), & JP62150649 A 19870704 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880912), vol. 012, no. 337, Database accession no. (E - 657), & JP63102172 A 19880507 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |