EP0895831 - Adjustable wrench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2001 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2001 [2001/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chiang, Cho-Cheng 5F-2, No. 455, Chung Cheng Road Yung Ho City Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states Chiang, Cho-Cheng 5F-2, No. 455, Chung Cheng Road Yung Ho City, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/06] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/06] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112316.1 | 18.07.1997 | [1999/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0895831 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B25B13/30, B25B13/34 | [1999/06] | CPC: |
B25B13/30 (EP);
B25B13/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einstellbarer Schraubenschlüssel | [1999/06] | English: | Adjustable wrench | [1999/06] | French: | Clé réglable | [1999/06] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1997 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 11.08.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE | 01.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/32] | 01.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.11.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2407990 (B.L.LURIE) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 17; figure - *; | [A]FR660773 (C.DECELIERE ET AL.) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US1367407 (O.B.MC CLURKIN) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US1414839 (A.STUARTS) [A] 1,3,5 * figure .; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2688893 (T.F.JACKSON) [A] 1,3 * figure -; claim - * |