EP0820966 - Colored film-coated glass article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-11, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyauchi, Taro, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kawazu, Mitsuhiro, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Maeda, Koichi, c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 5-11, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112358.3 | 18.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | JP19960193301 | 23.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19330196 | JP19960240431 | 11.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24043196 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0820966 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0820966 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/00 | [1998/05] | CPC: |
C03C17/007 (EP,US);
C03C17/008 (EP,US);
C03C2217/475 (EP,US);
C03C2217/479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1998/41] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Glasartikel beschichtet mit gefärbter Schicht | [1998/05] | English: | Colored film-coated glass article | [1998/05] | French: | Article de verre revêtu avec une couche colorée | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.06.2002 | [2004/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH07330379 ; | [A]JPH0797226 ; | [X]EP0598472 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [X] 1-6 * abstract *; | [PX]EP0739996 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * page 3, line 56 - page 5, line 6 *; | [PX]WO9723424 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-6 * abstract *; | [E]WO9731871 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, & JP07330379 A 19951219 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - P. INNOCENZI ET AL., "preparation of coating films doped with gold metal particles from mtes teos solutions", JOURNAL OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY., DORDRECHT NL, (1994), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 305 - 318, XP000442440 [A] 1-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00486173 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 95, no. 23, Database accession no. 95-175246, XP002046195 & JPH0797226 A 19950411 (AGENCY OF IND SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1 * abstract * |