EP0821064 - Recombinant fructosyl amino acid oxidase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57 Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | For all designated states Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co., Ltd. 57 Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Nobuo 3-18, Nishitsutsujigoaka miyamadai 2-chome Kameoka-shi, Kyoto 621 / JP | 02 /
Sakai, Yasuyoshi 40-8, Motomiya 2-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga 520 / JP | 03 /
Tani, Yoshiki 56, 60-1, Kamigamoshoubuen-cho, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 603 / JP | 04 /
Fukuya, Hiroshi, Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co., LTD. 57, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601 / JP | [1998/05] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112403.7 | 19.07.1997 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | JP19960193344 | 23.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19334496 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821064 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0821064 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0821064 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/53, C12N9/06, C12N5/10, C12N1/21 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
C12N9/0022 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/05] | C12N15/53, C12N9/06, C12N1/21, C12N15/70 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/47] |
Former [1998/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Recombinante Fructosyl-Aminosäure-Oxidase | [2002/41] | English: | Recombinant fructosyl amino acid oxidase | [1998/05] | French: | Fructosyl amino acide oxidase recombinante | [1998/05] |
Former [1998/05] | Recombinanter Fructosyl Aminosäure-Oxidase | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/33] | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH03155780 ; | [DE]EP0864647 (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [DE] 1,2,9* abstract *; | [A] - NOBUYUKI YOSHIDA ET AL, "DISTRIBUTION AND PROPERTIES OF FRUCTOSYL AMINO ACID OXIDASE IN FUNGI", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19951201), vol. 61, no. 12, pages 4487 - 4489, XP000561863 [A] 1,2,9 * the whole document * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 33, Database accession no. 91-241718, XP002089706 & JPH03155780 A 19910703 (NODA INST SCI RES) [DA] 1,2,9 * abstract * | [PX] - YOSHIDA N ET AL, "Primary structures of fungal fructosyl amino acid oxidases and their application to the measurement of glycated proteins.", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1996 DEC 15) 242 (3) 499-505, XP002089646 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1996.0499r.x |