EP0822362 - Solenoid valve with pressure compensation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kendrion Binder Magnete GmbH Mönchweiler Strasse 1 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [1999/47] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states Binder Magnete GmbH Mönchweiler Strasse 1 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oesterle, Hans Peter Lupfenstrasse 33 78609 Tuningen / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Heinz Habsburgerring 30 78048 VS-Villingen / DE | 03 /
Blaffert, Wolfgang Tannstrasse 110 78628 Rottweil / DE | 04 /
Zelano, Frank Neue Heimatstrasse 1 78112 St. Georgen / DE | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Buchner, Mussgnug Neunert, Göhring Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97112412.8 | 19.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | DE1996131000 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19631000 | DE1996140897 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19640897 | [1998/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822362 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822362 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/06 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
F16K31/0665 (EP,US);
G05D16/2022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/23] |
Former [1999/19] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magnetventil mit Druckausgleich | [1998/06] | English: | Solenoid valve with pressure compensation | [1998/06] | French: | Soupape magnétique avec compensation de pression | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1998 | Examination requested [1999/23] | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/32] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5524593 (DENNE ALBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - line 32 * [Y] 2,3,6-8; | [DY]DE4415096 (BINDER MAGNETE [DE]) [DY] 2,3,7,8 * abstract * * column 4, line 40 - line 42 * * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 3 *; | [Y]DE3907408 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - line 20 *; | [A]US4969629 (ATHANASSIU CHRISTOS [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4221821 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5501425 (REINICKE ROBERT H [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4415096 | WO8700963 |