blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0838543

EP0838543 - Loom with devices for holding and guiding frame connecting rods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lindauer Dornier GmbH
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
88129 Lindau / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
LINDAUER DORNIER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
88129 Lindau / DE
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
LINDAUER DORNIER GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H
Rickenbacher Strasse 119
D-88129 Lindau / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Kerner, Horst
Am Katzenholz 10
88161 Lindenberg / DE
02 / Häussler, Horst
Oberreitnauer Strasse 16d
88131 Lindau / DE
03 / Ludwig, Hubertus
Flurstrasse 16b
88131 Lindau / DE
[1998/18]
Application number, filing date97112667.724.07.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateDE199614037030.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19640370
[1998/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0838543
Date:29.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838543
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:D03C1/14, D03C9/00
[1998/18]
CPC:
D03C9/0683 (EP,US); D03C9/00 (EP,US); Y10T74/18944 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/02]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Webmaschine mit Vorrichtungen zum Aufnehmen und Führen von Schaftstangen[1998/18]
English:Loom with devices for holding and guiding frame connecting rods[1998/18]
French:Métier à tisser avec dispositifs pour recevoir et guider des bielles de commande de cadres[1998/18]
Examination procedure14.09.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
16.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.03.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.05.1999Fee for grant paid
31.05.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0654552  (RUETI AG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 54; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]EP0598163  (RUETI AG MASCHF [CH]) [AD] 1 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [AD]DE19548848  (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 35 - line 60; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US3888284  (TIERNAN STANLEY C, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 28 - line 63; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.