blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0826327

EP0826327 - Seating furniture with synchronised seat and backrest [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 29.10.2008  [2008/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jungjohann, Thomas
Wiesenstrasse 35
88521 Ertingen-Binzwangen / DE
[1998/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Moll, Reiner
Flachsäckerstrasse 9
73527 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Gesthuysen Patentanwälte
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 13 54
45013 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/44]Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54
45013 Essen / DE
Former [1998/10]Patentanwälte Gesthuysen, von Rohr, Weidener, Schüll, Häckel
Postfach 10 13 54
45013 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date97112801.225.07.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateDE1996103466528.08.1996         Original published format: DE 19634665
[1998/10]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0826327
Date:04.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0826327
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826327
Date:08.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:A47C1/032
[1998/10]
CPC:
A47C1/032 (EP,US); B60N2/0292 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL [2000/38]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Sitzmöbelelement mit einer gekoppelten Rückenlehnen- und Sitzverstellung[1998/10]
English:Seating furniture with synchronised seat and backrest[1998/10]
French:Meuble d'assise avec siège et dossier synchronisé[1998/10]
Examination procedure23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
13.07.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE
17.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.02.2002Fee for grant paid
08.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB529793  (FLORAL CITY FURNITURE CO) [Y] 1 * figure 8 *;
 [A]DE2459109  (PONTIAC FURNITURE IND) [A] 1-10 * page 3, paragraph 3 *;
 [A]US4452486  (ZAPF OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1* column 1, line 25 - line 32; figures 2,3 *;
 [DY]WO9525452  (P SCHULTZ & CO AS [DK], et al) [DY] 1 * column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *;
 [PX]US5636898  (DIXON RICHARD W [US], et al) [PX] 1-7 * column 2, line 25 - line 32; figure 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.