EP0822110 - A filler pipe unit for the fuel tank of a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.2006 [2006/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERGOM HOLDING S.p.A Via Stura 1/3 10071 Borgaro Torinese (Torino) / IT | [2005/02] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states ERGOM MATERIE PLASTICHE S.p.A Via Stura 1/3 I-10071 Borgaro Torinese (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cimminelli, Francesco Corso Vinzaglio 15 10121 Torino / IT | 02 /
Siviero, Eugenio Via Moriondo, 3 10040 Rivalta (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Castagneri, Giulio Via Banna, 4 10076 Nole (Torino) / IT | [2005/04] |
Former [1998/06] | 01 /
Cimminelli, Francesco Largo Cibrario, 10 10143 Torino / IT | ||
02 /
Siviero, Eugenio Via Moriondo, 3 10040 Rivalta (Torino) / IT | |||
03 /
Castagneri, Giulio Via Banna, 4 10076 Nole (Torino) / IT | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Rambelli, Paolo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1998/06] | Marchitelli, Mauro, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97112998.6 | 29.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00661 | 30.07.1996 Original published format: IT TO960661 | [1998/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822110 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822110 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822110 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/04, B60K15/035 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
B60K15/035 (EP,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,US);
B60K15/04 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86324 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86332 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/12] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinfüllstutzen-Modul für Kraftfahrzeug | [1998/06] | English: | A filler pipe unit for the fuel tank of a motor vehicle | [1998/06] | French: | Module de tuyau de remplissage du réservoir d'essence d'un véhicule | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 15.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 18.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0636505 (ERGOM MATERIE PLASTICHE SPA [IT]) [A] 1,8-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 38 * * column 4, line 31 - line 39 * * figure -; claims 1-6,17 *; | [A]EP0604320 (JOURNEE PAUL SA [FR]) [A] 1-4,6,7 * column 1, line 14 - line 16 * * column 4, line 47 - column 5, line 9 * * column 7, line 14 - line 37; figures 1,3-5 *; | [A]FR2686840 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 5 * the whole document * |