EP0822433 - Large relative aperture telecentric lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugawara, Saburo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/06] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113007.5 | 29.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | JP19960202062 | 31.07.1996 Original published format: JP 20206296 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822433 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822433 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | [1998/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822433 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/22 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
G02B13/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/27] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Telezentrisches Objektiv hoher Apertur | [1998/06] | English: | Large relative aperture telecentric lens | [1998/06] | French: | Objectif télécentrique à grand taux d'ouverture | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.07.2009 | [2010/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3909115 (KANO ICHIRO) [X] 1,12 * figures 1,3; examples 1,2; claim 1 * * column 1, line 2 - line 15 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 14 *; | [XA]US4572620 (KIKUCHI JURO [JP]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 4 - line 15 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 59 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 27 * [A] 9; | [A]US4891663 (HIROSE RYUSHO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 3, line 5 - line 33; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5303087 (HAYAKAWA SHINGO [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 15 - line 32 *; | [A]US5539579 (MIYATAKE YOSHITO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 14, line 1 - line 7; figure 11; table 2 * | by applicant | JPH04311910 | US3909115 | US4572620 | US4891663 |