EP0827762 - Wheels for in-line rollerskates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pawlowski, Christoph Nordenhamer Strasse 231 27751 Delmenhorst / DE | For all designated states Langer, Günter Walter-Flex-Weg 24b 27753 Delmenhorst / DE | For all designated states Meyer, Wilhelm Buchenstrasse 19 26919 Brake / DE | [1998/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113103.2 | 30.07.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | DE1996215350U | 05.09.1996 Original published format: DE 29615350 U | DE1996215351U | 05.09.1996 Original published format: DE 29615351 U | [1998/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827762 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827762 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/06 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
F16C33/80 (EP,US);
A63C17/22 (EP,US);
A63C17/24 (EP,US);
F16C2316/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/42] |
Former [1998/48] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rolle für Rollschuhe vom Inline-Skate-Typ | [1998/11] | English: | Wheels for in-line rollerskates | [1998/11] | French: | Rouleaux pour patins à roulettes en ligne | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 16.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 17.10.2001 | GB | 17.10.2001 | IT | 17.10.2001 | NL | 17.10.2001 | DK | 17.01.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 17.10.2001 | |
GB | 17.10.2001 | ||
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GB | 17.10.2001 | |
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
DK | 17.01.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | GB | 17.10.2001 | |
NL | 17.10.2001 | ||
Former [2002/37] | GB | 17.10.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3823952 (KUKULOWICZ A) [X] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document * [Y] 3; | [Y]US4898403 (JOHNSON LENNART B [US]) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 2; figure - *; | [A]WO9426366 (KOEFLACH SPORTGERAETE GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1* abstract * |