EP0841704 - Semiconductor transistor device and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul-Drude-Institut für Festkörperelektronik Hausvogteiplatz 5-7 10117 Berlin / DE | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedland, K.-J., Dr. Lehnitzstrasse 49C 12623 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Hey, R., Dr. Märkische Allee 222 12679 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kostial, H., Dr. Geschwister-Scholl-Strasse 5 10117 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Höricke, M. Ernst-Thälmann-Strasse 22 16341 Schwanebeck / DE | 05 /
Ploog, K.H., Prof. Dr. Ludwig-Jahn-Strasse 6 15566 Schöneiche / DE | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Morgan, James Garnet, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Morgan, James Garnet, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Morgan, James G., et al Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113111.5 | 30.07.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | EP19960117884 | 07.11.1996 Original published format: EP 96117884 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841704 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/15, H01L29/36, H01L29/778, H01L29/775, H01L21/335 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
H01L29/155 (EP);
H01L29/66462 (EP);
H01L29/66469 (EP);
H01L29/775 (EP);
H01L29/7785 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/04] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Transistorhalbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1998/20] | English: | Semiconductor transistor device and method of manufacturing the same | [1998/20] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur à transistor et méthode de fabrication | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 14.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/32] | 12.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6235678 ; | [X]JPS62136882 ; | [DY]EP0394757 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT) [DY] 6,12-14 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4882609 (SCHUBERT ERDMANN ET AL) [DA] 1,7 * column 9, line 53 - column 10, line 43; figures 1J,1G *; | [PX] - FRIEDLAND K -J ET AL, "New concept for the reduction of impurity scattering in remotely doped GaAs quantum wells", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, 25 NOV. 1996, APS, USA, ISSN 0031-9007, vol. 77, no. 22, pages 4616 - 4619, XP002044440 [PX] 1-14 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870714), vol. 011, no. 217, Database accession no. (E - 523), & JP62035678 A 19870216 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-5,7-11 * abstract * [Y] 6,12-14 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871126), vol. 011, no. 363, Database accession no. (E - 560), & JP62136882 A 19870619 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - NGUYEN L D ET AL, "INFLUENCE OF QUANTUM-WELL WIDTH ON DEVICE PERFORMANCE OF AL0.30GA0.70AS/INP0.25GA0.75AS (ON GAAS) MODFET'S", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, (19890501), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 833 - 838, XP000099014 [A] 5,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.299663 |