EP0822588 - Doped silicon substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behnke, Gudrun, Dr. Rossini Strasse 6 86199 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Wecker, Dorit, Dr. Bussardstrasse 36 82008 Unterhaching / DE | 03 /
Mayer, Karl Gerbergasse 23 9500 Villach / AT | [1998/06] | Application number, filing date | 97113232.9 | 31.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | DE1996131115 | 01.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19631115 | [1998/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0822588 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0822588 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/322, H01L21/22 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
H01L21/2205 (EP);
H01L21/3221 (EP);
H01L29/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | [1998/45] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dotiertes Siliziumsubstrat | [1998/06] | English: | Doped silicon substrate | [1998/06] | French: | Substrat en silicium dopé | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/10] | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.10.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.10.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.10.1998 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0604234 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 3 - line 15 * * column 2, line 30 - line 33 * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 1; figures 3A-3D * * column 11, line 45 - column 12, line 46; figure 10D * [Y] 3,4; | [XAY]US4662956 (ROTH SCOTT S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 5 - line 20 * * column 1, line 25 - line 58; figure 1 * * column 3, line 7 - line 16 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 14; figure 2 * * column 4, line 31 - line 62; figures 3-5 * * column 5, line 32 - line 38 * * column 5, line 51 - line 56 * [A] 2 [Y] 3,4; | [XA]DE4304849 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 27; figures 23-25 * * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 45 - line 55 * * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 33; figures 1,21,22 * * column 9, line 21 - line 27 * [A] 3,4; | [XA]DE3910185 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 1 - line 27 * * page 2, line 64 - page 3, line 1 * * page 3, line 15 - line 18 * * page 3, line 24 - line 33 * * page 4, line 3 - line 6 * [A] 3,4; | [XA]EP0635879 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 15 - line 25 * * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 10 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 17 - line 25 * * column 9, line 9 - line 46; figure 14 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 1 * [A] 3,4 |