EP0825295 - Calender [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2001/05] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Voith Paper GmbH Birkschenweg 5 47803 Krefeld / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Finishing GmbH Birkschenweg 5 47803 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cramer, Dirk Raiffeisenstrasse 187 47259 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Müller, Horst Mathildenstrasse 195 41239 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
Wagner, Ulrich Auf dem Schelberg 45 47669 Wachtendonk / DE | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing., et al Kühhornshofweg 10 60320 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113280.8 | 01.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | DE1996133671 | 21.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19633671 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825295 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825295 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825295 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/44] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0825295 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
D21G1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [1999/42] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kalander | [1998/09] | English: | Calender | [1998/09] | French: | Calandre | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.07.2002
23.07.2002
ADMISSIBLE Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.07.2002
Eduard Küsters Maschinenfabrik GmbH & Co. KG Eduard-Küsters-Strasse 1 47805 Krefeld / DE Opponent's representative Henseler, Daniela, Dr. Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | 11.09.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.01.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.05.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.05.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.02.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 01.08.2004 | FR | 29.04.2005 | [2005/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0027270 (VALMET OY [FI]) [A] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3121713 (VALMET OY [FI]) | Opposition | US4332191 | DE19521402 | DE3738973 | - Wochenblatt für Papierfabrikation 16, 1995, S. 698 bis 701, "Das Janus Concept - eine neue Satinage-Technologie" | - "Manual of Supercalender Operations", Francis E. Schiller, 1976, S. 56, Catwalks and electri-powered lifts |