EP0825303 - Operating means for a discharge- and/or flushing valve actuated by vacuum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROEDIGER VAKUUM- und HAUSTECHNIK GmbH Kinzigheimer Weg 104 - 106 63450 Hanau / DE | [2000/18] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Roediger Anlagenbau GmbH Kinzigheimer Weg 104 D-63450 Hanau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galler, Lothar Feldstrasse 19 63546 Hammersbach / DE | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113543.9 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | DE1996133178 | 17.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19633178 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825303 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825303 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
E03F1/006 (EP,US);
E03D5/09 (EP,US);
Y10S137/907 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3109 (EP,US);
Y10T137/402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, PT, SE [2000/48] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, LI | ||
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung für ein mit Unterdruck betätigbares Absaug- und/oder Wasserventil | [1998/09] | English: | Operating means for a discharge- and/or flushing valve actuated by vacuum | [1998/09] | French: | Moyens de commande d'une vanne de décharge et/ou de chasse d'eau à dépression | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 26.08.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, DK, IE, LU, MC, NL | 07.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.10.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.10.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1588324 (JERED IND INC) [A] 1* page 4, line 113 - page 5, line 47; figure 5 *; | [A]DE4335945 (ROEDIGER ANLAGENBAU [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 15 - column 5, line 33; figures 1-3 * |