EP0823644 - Production processes of color filter and liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/07] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Kenichi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yoshimura, Fumitaka Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Hiroyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Osano, Nagato Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Sakamoto, Junichi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/07] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/07] | Weser, Wolfgang Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113603.1 | 06.08.1997 | [1998/07] | Priority number, date | JP19960209789 | 08.08.1996 Original published format: JP 20978996 | JP19960243195 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24319596 | JP19970206328 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: JP 20632897 | [1998/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0823644 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0823644 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | [1998/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0823644 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/02, G02F1/1335, B41J2/01 | [1998/07] | CPC: |
G02F1/133516 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133514 (KR);
G02B5/201 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/223 (KR);
G02F1/133512 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2202/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/13] |
Former [1998/07] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Farbfilter und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [1998/07] | English: | Production processes of color filter and liquid crystal display device | [1998/07] | French: | Procédé de production de filtre coloré et panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [1998/07] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/11] | 06.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59178416 ; | [A]JPH08179110 ; | [A]JPH08166507 ; | [DA]JPH06347637 ; | [A]US5340619 (CHEN YIH-WEN [US], et al) [A] 1,4,15 * column 6, line 65 - line 68 * * column 7, line 61 * * column 9, line 23 - line 24 *; | [X]EP0665449 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,15-18 * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 9; figures 4,7,8,11 * * page 5, line 57 - page 6, line 22 * * page 6, line 43 * * page 7, line 9 - line 16 * * page 7, line 19 - line 31; figure 3 * * page 8, line 1 - line 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850216), vol. 009, no. 037, Database accession no. (P - 335), & JP59178416 A 19841009 (TOSHIBA KK) [A] 1,4,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 096, no. 011, & JP08179110 A 19960712 (CANON INC) [A] 1-3,16,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961031), vol. 096, no. 010, & JP08166507 A 19960625 (CANON INC) [A] 1-3,16,17 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 095, no. 003, & JP06347637 A 19941222 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [DA] 1 * abstract * |