EP0896187 - Headlamp unit mit screen arrangement und shift actuator for the screen arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/06] | Shift actuator for screen arrangement | ||
[2006/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2004/48] |
Former [1999/06] | For all designated states Hella KG Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Döring, Berthold An der Schlamme 20 59457 Werl-Büderich / DE | 02 /
Jablotschkin, Werner Fettpottweg 33 33142 Büren / DE | 03 /
Kathmann, Franz Robert-Koch-Strasse 36 59555 Lippstadt / DE | [1999/06] | Application number, filing date | 97113732.8 | 08.08.1997 | [1999/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0896187 | Date: | 10.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0896187 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F21V14/08 | [2006/09] | CPC: |
F21S41/686 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/06] | F21M3/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT, SE [1999/42] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | SI | 14.08.1997 | Title | German: | Scheinwerfereinheit mit Blendenanordnung und Schaltvorrichtung für die Blendenanordnung | [2006/01] | English: | Headlamp unit mit screen arrangement und shift actuator for the screen arrangement | [2006/01] | French: | Ensemble projecteur avec écran et dispositif de commande de l'écran | [2006/01] |
Former [1999/06] | Schaltvorrichtung für eine Blendenanordnung | ||
Former [1999/06] | Shift actuator for screen arrangement | ||
Former [1999/06] | Dispositif de commande pour ensemble d'écran | Examination procedure | 30.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 06.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | AT | 08.08.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/29] | GB | 14.06.2006 | |
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | SE | 14.09.2006 | |
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0381851 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 46 - line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]DE4301936 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,9,10 * column 4, line 6 - line 47; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2279452 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * page 3, line 30 - page 8, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0590454 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1,6 * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | DE3939710 |