EP0825113 - Method and device for tranferring a single moving layer of tobacco products to a multi-layer stream of articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | Change - representative | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Decouflé s.a.r.l. 2, avenue du Président François Mitterrand 91380 Chilly-Mazarin / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states Decouflé s.a.r.l. 2, avenue du Président François Mitterand 91380 Chilly-Mazarin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sandkamp, Peter 41bis, Rue Pasteur 91330 Yerres / FR | 02 /
Pearson, Sean Tarpenbekstrasse 48 20251 Hamburg / DE | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Günther, et al Hauni Maschinenbau AG, 105/Patentabteilung 21027 Hamburg / DE | [1999/26] |
Former [1999/16] | Herrmann, Günther c/o Hauni Werke Körber & Co. KG Patentabteilung Kampchaussee 8-30 D-2050 Hamburg 80 / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Hiss, Ludwig, Pat. Ass. Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o Hauni Maschinenbau AG, 105/Patentabteilung, Kampchaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97113798.9 | 09.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | DE1996133653 | 21.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19633653 | [1998/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0825113 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B65B19/10 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
B65B19/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1998/45] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überführen einer bewegten einlagigen Reihe von Artikeln der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie in einen mehrlagigen Strom von Artikeln | [1998/09] | English: | Method and device for tranferring a single moving layer of tobacco products to a multi-layer stream of articles | [1998/09] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour transférer une seule couche d'articles de tabac se déplacant à un courant multi-couches d'articles | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/25] | 14.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.10.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.10.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.10.1998 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2098971 (FOCKE) [A] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document * |