Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0809399
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] |
26.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] |
09.05.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
17.05.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
10.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.01.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.09.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.10.2001 [2001/43] |
10.08.2001 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
07.11.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.04.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
03.04.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.03.2000 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
22.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.10.1999 |
First examination report |
|
11.10.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.06.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
18.12.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] |
22.10.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.10.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] |
12.09.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|