EP0835692 - Apparatus for applying a coating material on a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hugo Brennenstuhl GmbH & Co. KG Seestrasse 1 - 3 72074 Tübingen-Pfrondorf / DE | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brennenstuhl, Hugo Albstrasse 24 72074 Tübingen / DE | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Reimold, Otto, et al Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/16] | Reimold, Otto, Dipl.-Phys.Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. O. Reimold Dipl.-Phys.Dr. H. Vetter Dipl.-Ing. Martin Abel Hölderlinweg 58 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114150.2 | 16.08.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | DE1996141958 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19641958 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0835692 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0835692 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835692 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/26, B05B5/08, B05B7/14, B05B15/04 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
B05B1/262 (EP);
B05B12/18 (EP);
B05B5/087 (EP);
B05B7/1486 (EP);
B05B1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2002/03] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbringen von Beschichtungsgut auf einen Gegenstand | [1998/16] | English: | Apparatus for applying a coating material on a workpiece | [1998/16] | French: | Dispositif d'application d'un produit de revêtement sur un objet | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 26.10.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 17.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 22.01.2003 | IT | 22.01.2003 | CH | 31.08.2003 | LI | 31.08.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 22.01.2003 | |
CH | 31.08.2003 | ||
LI | 31.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/33] | CH | 31.08.2003 | |
LI | 31.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3811620 (GEBHARDT O) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US4011991 (MASUDA SENICHI) [A] 1,2 * column 9, line 63 - column 10, line 36; figure 8 * | by applicant | DE2036279 |