EP0826975 - Bias-free symmetric dual spin valve giant magnetoresistance transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states READ-RITE CORPORATION 345 Los Coches Street Milpitas California 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states READ-RITE CORPORATION 345 Los Coches Street Milpitas California 95035 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tan, Minshen 3447 Maybird Circle Fremont, California 94555 / US | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr. rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114297.1 | 19.08.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | US19960702961 | 26.08.1996 Original published format: US 702961 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0826975 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0826975 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | [1998/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/09, G11B5/39 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
G01R33/093 (EP,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
G11B5/3903 (EP,US);
H01F10/3268 (EP,US);
H10N50/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1999/19] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vormagnetisierungsfreie, symmetrische, doppeltes Spin-Ventil Riesenmagnetowiderstandswandler | [1998/10] | English: | Bias-free symmetric dual spin valve giant magnetoresistance transducer | [1998/10] | French: | Transducteur à magnétorésistance géante de spin-valve duale symétrique sans polarisation | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/14] | 01.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/34] | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5287238 (BAUMGART PETER M [US], et al); | [X]DE4301704 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US5508867 (CAIN WILLIAM C [US], et al); | [X]EP0724302 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [PX]EP0749112 (TDK CORP [JP]); |