EP0831329 - Automatic analyser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | For all designated states Abbott Laboratories Chad 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arnquist, David C. 4437 Larner Street The Colony, Texas 75056 / US | 02 /
Barnes, Grady, III 140 Mallard Ct. Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | 03 /
Button, Richard D. 311 Meadowcrest Drive Richardson, Texas 75080 / US | 04 /
Dunn, Chadwick M. 2004 Pine Drive McHenry, Illinois 60050 / US | 05 /
East, Richard C., Jr. 13126 Fall Manor Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | 06 /
Fritchie, Patrick P. 218 Westwood Drive Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 07 /
Galitz, Charles M. 7540 18th Avenue Kenosha, Wisconsin 53143 / US | 08 /
Grandone, Cass J. 235 Creekway Bend Southlake, Texas 76092 / US | 09 /
Gardner, Gregory E. 805 Dickey Drive Euless, Texas 76040 / US | 10 /
Gray, Robert C. 36409 N. Streamwood Drive Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | 11 /
Holen, James T. 938 Dublin Drive Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | 12 /
Luoma, Robert P., II 2700 Crestwood Lane Highland Village, Texas 75067 / US | 13 /
McCory, Jimmy D. 711 Richmond Lane Keller, Texas 76248 / US | 14 /
Mitchell, James E. 9 Magnolia Road Windham, New Hampshire 03087 / US | 15 /
Murray, Adrian John 2526 N. Dryden Place Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US | 16 /
Murray, David W. 17 Highland Court Allen, Texas 75002 / US | 17 /
Ramsey, Jack F. 51 Camridge Drive Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | 18 /
Sleszynski, Neal T. 2521 80th Place Kenosha, Wisconsin 53143 / US | 19 /
Toth, Julius J. 801 Castleton Court Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | [1998/13] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/13] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114411.8 | 20.08.1997 | [1998/13] | Priority number, date | US19960715780 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: US 715780 | US19960715924 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: US 715924 | US19960716079 | 19.09.1996 Original published format: US 716079 | US19970816121 | 11.03.1997 Original published format: US 816121 | [1998/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0831329 | Date: | 25.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0831329 | Date: | 12.08.1998 | [1998/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0831329 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/04 | [1998/13] | CPC: |
B01L3/508 (EP);
G01N21/76 (EP);
G01N35/0092 (EP);
G01N35/04 (EP);
B01L2300/0851 (EP);
G01N2035/00534 (EP);
G01N2035/00752 (EP);
G01N2035/0465 (EP);
G01N2035/0467 (EP);
G01N35/025 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/27] |
Former [1999/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, LI | ||
Former [1998/13] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Analysevorrichtung | [1998/13] | English: | Automatic analyser | [1998/13] | French: | Analyseur automatique | [1998/13] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 16.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 13.02.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 01.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 12.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01116681.6 / EP1167977 | EP98120632.9 / EP0898171 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 19.04.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2144110 (AUTOMATISME CIE GLE) [X] 1-3,25,35 * page 4, line 2 - page 5, line 25; figure - *; | [X]DE3934890 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,25,35 * column 9, line 5 - line 68; figure 5; claim - *; | [A]US5244633 (JAKUBOWICZ RAYMOND F [US], et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 14 * * column 6, line 14 - line 37 *; | [A]EP0567892 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 29; figures 1-3; claim - *; | [A]EP0712000 (CIBA CORNING DIAGNOSTICS CORP [US]) [A] 4,15 * column 5, line 11 - line 18; figures 2,3 * * page 8, line 7 - line 32 ** page 16, line 42 - line 58 *; | [X]WO9625712 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,16,25,35 * page 5, line 20 - line 30 * * page 17, line 15 - page 18, line 18 * * page 19, line 12 - line 26 * * page 20, line 33 - page 21, line 28 * * page 24, line 10 - line 14; figure 5 * |