EP0825551 - Data output control method and apparatus, and associated control program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maekawa, Shinichiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Hiromi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114491.0 | 21.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | JP19960222236 | 23.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22223696 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825551 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825551 | Date: | 24.02.1999 | [1999/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825551 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/00, G06F3/12, G06K15/02 | [1999/07] | CPC: |
G06K15/00 (EP,US);
G06F3/1207 (EP,US);
G06F3/1229 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/09] | G06K15/00, G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/44] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenausgangssteuerung und Steuerungsprogramm dafür | [1998/09] | English: | Data output control method and apparatus, and associated control program | [1998/09] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de contrôle de sortie de données, et programme de contrôle associé | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 09.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0654757 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-15,17-23,26 * page 3, line 26 - line 53 * * page 6, line 14 - page 8, line L * [Y] 8,16,24; | [YA]EP0661600 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 8,16,24 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 2; figure -; claim - * [A] 25; | [XA]US4930087 (EGAWA JIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6,9,12,14 * column 2, line 34 - line 64 * * column 17, line 62 - column 18, line 58 * * column 26, line 17 - line 44 * [A] 25 |