EP0825063 - Apparatus for automatically controlling a direction of an optical axis of a vehicle headlight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuchi, Hiroaki c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP | [1998/09] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/09] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114601.4 | 22.08.1997 | [1998/09] | Priority number, date | JP19960220881 | 22.08.1996 Original published format: JP 22088196 | [1998/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0825063 | Date: | 25.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0825063 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | [1998/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0825063 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/115 | [1998/09] | CPC: |
B60Q1/115 (EP);
B60Q2300/114 (EP);
B60Q2300/116 (EP);
B60Q2300/132 (EP);
B60Q2300/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/15] |
Former [1998/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur automatischen Steuerung der Richtung der optischen Achse eines Scheinwerfers | [1998/09] | English: | Apparatus for automatically controlling a direction of an optical axis of a vehicle headlight | [1998/09] | French: | Dispositif de commande automatique de la direction de l'axe optique d'un phare de véhicule | [1998/09] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 09.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4019690 (GRESE ANTJE [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 1 * * figure - * [A] 4-7; | [XA]EP0600798 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 7 - line 54 * * column 8, line 17 - line 27 * * column 8, line 36 - line 53 * * figure - * [A] 5; | [XA]FR2505750 (MARCHAL EQUIPEMENTS AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [X] 6 * page 1, line 8 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 17 * * page 5, line 9 - line 19 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 25 * * figure - * [A] 2,4; | [A]EP0355539 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 2,5 * page 3, line 13 - line 18 * * page 3, line 55 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 2 * * figure 3 * | Examination | DE3129891 | by applicant | JPH05229383 | JPH05250901 | JPH0632169 | JPS61158530U |