EP0827986 - Bridged perinone, quinophthalone and perinone-quinophthalone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalz, Dietmar, Dr. Zum Thielensiefen 2 53819 Neunkirchen / DE | 02 /
Arlt, Dieter, Prof. Dr. Rybniker Strasse 2 51065 Köln / DE | 03 /
Reinhardt, Karl-Heinz Bleerstrasse 43 b 40789 Monheim / DE | [1998/11] | Application number, filing date | 97114706.1 | 25.08.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | DE1996136032 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19636032 | DE1996136033 | 05.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19636033 | DE1997106900 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: DE 19706900 | [1998/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0827986 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0827986 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827986 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09B57/12, C09B25/00, C08K5/34, C07D307/89, C07C63/331 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
C09B57/12 (EP,US);
C09B25/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/11] | C09B57/12, C09B25/00, C08K5/34 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, LI [1999/24] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbrückte Perinone, Chinophthalone und Perinon-Chinophthalone | [1998/11] | English: | Bridged perinone, quinophthalone and perinone-quinophthalone | [1998/11] | French: | Périnone, quinophtalone et périnone-quinophtalone pontées | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01107749.2 / EP1118640 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]BE678479 (ICI) [Y] 1-7,15-18 * page 6, paragraph L *; | [Y]CH463667 (SANDOZ AG [CH]) [Y] 1-7,15-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR1564232 (BASF) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-11,15-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2116431 (CIBA GEIGY AG) [Y] 1,2,5,6,8-11,15-18 * page 1, line 4 - page 2, line 15 *; | [DY]FR1075110 (FRANCOLOR SA) [DY] 1,2,5,6,8-11,15-18 * page 2; examples 16,17 *; | [Y]JPH01261462 ; | [YX]FR2126731 (TRW INC) [Y] 1-18 * page 4, line 7 * * page 4, line 20 * * page 4, line 9 * [X] 16; | [Y]EP0315992 (CHEMIE LINZ GMBH [AT]) [Y] 1-18 * page 3, line 41 - page 4, line 7 *; | [Y]FR1566931 (GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY) [Y] 1-18 * examples 1,4 *; | [Y]EP0438382 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-18 * page 3, line 3 - line 20 *; | [A]FR2369323 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [Y] - B.K MANUKIAN ET AL, "chinophthalone", CHIMIA, aarau-ch, (1970), vol. 24, no. 9, pages 328 - 339, XP002073520 [Y] 1-7,15-18 * page 332; figure 15 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890117), vol. 014, no. 020, Database accession no. (C - 676), & JP01261462 A 19891018 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM INC) [Y] 1,2,5,6,12,14-18 * abstract * |