EP0813176 - Check-out device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka 410-2392 / JP | [2004/41] |
Former [1997/51] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naoki, Ito 2-51, Higashi-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugiura, Jiro 27 Naka, Nirayama-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Tsutomu 2-6-21, Numakita-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 04 /
Usui, Mitsuaki 797-2, Oyama Oyama-cho Suntou-gun Shizuoka-ken / JP | 05 /
Kobayashi, Masayuki 2-4-106, Higashihoncho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1998/11] |
Former [1997/51] | 01 /
Naoki, Ito 2-51, Higashi-cho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sugiura, Jiro 27 Naka, Nirayama-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Ikeda, Tsutomu 2-6-21, Numakita-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Usui, Mitsuaki 332 Moriki, Oohito-cho Tagata-gun, Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Kobayashi, Masayuki 2-4-106, Higashihoncho Mishima-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/03] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/51] | Weber, Joachim, Dr. Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber, Patentanwälte, Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114743.4 | 17.07.1992 | [1997/51] | Priority number, date | JP19910179932 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17993291 | JP19910179933 | 19.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17993391 | JP19910211696 | 23.08.1991 Original published format: JP 21169691 | JP19910264293 | 14.10.1991 Original published format: JP 26429391 | JP19910284930 | 30.10.1991 Original published format: JP 28493091 | JP19910335405 | 19.12.1991 Original published format: JP 33540591 | JP19920000493 | 07.01.1992 Original published format: JP 49392 | JP19920078109 | 01.04.1992 Original published format: JP 7810992 | [1997/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0813176 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0813176 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, A47F9/04 | [1997/51] | CPC: |
G07G1/0072 (EP,US);
G06Q30/06 (KR);
A47F9/048 (EP,US);
G01G11/006 (EP,US);
G01G19/4144 (EP,US);
G06Q20/20 (KR);
G07G1/0054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1997/51] | Title | German: | Warenabrechnungsanlage | [1997/51] | English: | Check-out device | [1997/51] | French: | Dispositif d'enregistrement en caisse de sortie | [1997/51] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1997 | Examination requested [1997/51] | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92112241.2 / EP0525546 | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2161631 (CHECKROBOT INC) [AD] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]WO8810480 (NCR CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * |