EP0829971 - Circuit for transmit-receive switching [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH 81663 München / DE | [2002/04] |
Former [1999/52] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft 81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG 81663 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states Daimler-Benz Aerospace Aktiengesellschaft 81663 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldle, Heinz-Peter, Dr. Weihermahd 27 89250 Senden / DE | 02 /
Ludwig, Michael Töpferweg 7 89155 Erbach / DE | 03 /
Reber, Rolf Hahnengasse 4 89073 Ulm / DE | 04 /
Schweizer, Bernhard Spielmannsgasse 12 89077 Ulm / DE | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas, et al c/o Dornier GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Meel, Thomas, et al Dornier GmbH L H G 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Straub, Bernd DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Managament Sedanstr. 10 / Geb. 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [2000/11] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/52] | Fröhling, Werner Otto, Dr., et al DaimlerChrysler AG, Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstr. 10/Gebäude 17 89077 Ulm / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | Fröhling, Werner Otto, Dr. Daimler-Benz Aerospace AG Patentabteilung Wörthstrasse 85 89077 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114803.6 | 27.08.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | DE1996134677 | 28.08.1996 Original published format: DE 19634677 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829971 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829971 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0829971 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/44 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
H04B1/46 (EP);
H04B1/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2004/15] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung für einen Sende-Empfangsschalter | [1998/12] | English: | Circuit for transmit-receive switching | [1998/12] | French: | Circuit pour commutation émission-réception | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0622908 (MOTOROLA INC) [X] 1-7 * column 3, line 57 - column 7, line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0496498 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract;; figure 1 * | Examination | WO9703367 |