EP0833018 - Hinge device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2002 [2002/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel, Susanne Wibelstrasse 19 74670 Forchtenberg / DE | [1998/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Hans Patentanwälte Magenbauer, Reimold, Vetter & Abel Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | Vetter, Hans, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Magenbauer Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Otto Reimold Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Hans Vetter, Dipl.-Ing. Martin Abel, H lderlinweg 58 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97114965.3 | 29.08.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | DE1996216848U | 27.09.1996 Original published format: DE 29616848 U | [1998/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0833018 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0833018 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18, F16B7/04 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
F16B7/04 (EP);
E04F11/1817 (EP);
E04F11/1834 (EP);
E04F2011/1821 (EP);
E04F2011/1831 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1999/13] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gelenkvorrichtung | [1998/14] | English: | Hinge device | [1998/14] | French: | Dispositif d'articulation | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 16.01.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/37] | 08.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0401112 (SAVREUX CHRISTIAN FELIX AUGUST [FR]) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CH674401 (STRACK AG FAHRZEUGBAU UND BLEC) [Y] 1,2,10-12 * page 3, column R, line 38 - page 4, column R, line 38; figures 1-14 *; | [A]EP0008555 (DES ETABLISSEMENTS POURTEAU SO [FR]) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 36 - page 7, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4767232 (FRANCIS PATRICK A [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 49 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0688920 (NEUCON MASCH BAUSYSTEM [DE]) [A] 1-3,9-11 * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 30 * * column 12, line 10 - line 46 * * column 14, line 18 - column 15, line 25; figures 5-7,13,14,18 * |