EP0899634 - Device for immersion in water and comprising a sound transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2003/14] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states ASULAB S.A. Faubourg du Lac 6 CH-2501 Bienne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mignot, Jean-Pierre Chasselas 13 2034 Pesseux / CH | 02 /
Dinnissen, Paul Kanalweg 1 2556 Schwadernau / CH | [1999/09] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 97114985.1 | 29.08.1997 | [1999/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0899634 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0899634 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/00, G04B37/11 | [1999/09] | CPC: |
G04B37/0075 (EP);
G04B37/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/46] |
Former [1999/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verwendung unter Wasser und mit einem Schallwandler | [1999/09] | English: | Device for immersion in water and comprising a sound transducer | [1999/09] | French: | Appareillage susceptible d'être immergé et comprenant un transducteur sonore | [1999/09] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/44] | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.07.2003 | [2008/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH375664 (FABRIQUE DES MONTRES VULCAIN ET STUDIO S.A.) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 16 - page 35 *; | [A]US4872148 (KIRBY) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 44 - line 47 *; | [A]JPS58206998 ; | [A]JPS5520464 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840316), vol. 8, no. 58, Database accession no. (P - 261), & JP58206998 A 19831202 (DAINI SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800417), vol. 4, no. 51, Database accession no. (P - 007), & JP55020464 A 19800213 (SEIKO INSTR & ELECTRONICS LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |