EP0828038 - Double floor support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICOWA Verfahrenstechnik für Baustoffe GmbH & Co. KG Dormagener Strasse 46 50129 Bergheim / DE | For all designated states ProMineral Gesellschaft zur Verwendung von Mineralstoffen mbH Dormagener Strasse 2 50129 Bergheim / DE | [2000/20] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states SICOWA Verfahrenstechnik für Baustoffe GmbH & Co. KG Hander Weg 17 D-52072 Aachen / DE | ||
For all designated states ProMineral Gesellschaft zur Verwendung von Mineralstoffen mbH Dormagener Strasse 2 50129 Bergheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beckmannshagen, Klaus Dipl. Ing. Elsa-Brandströmstr. 18 52070 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Eyhoff, Dieter Dipl.Ing. Dr. Overhues-Allee 24 52355 Düren / DE | 03 /
Glitza, Horst Dipl. Ing. Am Römerberg 11 56291 Kisselbach / DE | 04 /
Häussler, Andreas Dipl.- Ing. Augustastr. 70 52070 Aachen / DE | 05 /
Hessler, Klaus-Michael Zum Wurmtal 12 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | 06 /
Koll, Wolfgang Dr. Ing. Lorsbeckerstr. 14 52248 Jülich / DE | 07 /
Lammel, Michael Dipl.-Ing. Bismarckstr. 106 52066 Aachen / DE | 08 /
Manthey, Christiane Dipl.- Ing. Purweider Weg 20a 42070 Aachen / DE | 09 /
Röske, Detlev, Dipl.-Ing. Schulinstr. 32 97357 Prinsenstadt / DE | 10 /
Schmitz, Wolfgang Dr. rer. nat. Pestalozzistr. 5 52511 Geilenkirchen / DE | 11 /
Zachorodny, Dariusz Dipl. Ing. Im Peschgen 21 B-4700 Eupen / BE | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/06] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/11] | Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115070.1 | 30.08.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | DE1996148102 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19648102 | DE1996135820 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19635820 | DE1996148101 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19648101 | DE1996148103 | 21.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19648103 | EP19970108191 | 21.05.1997 Original published format: EP 97108191 | [1998/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828038 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828038 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/024 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
E04F15/02482 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Installationsbodenstütze | [1998/11] | English: | Double floor support | [1998/11] | French: | Support pour faux plancher | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/37] | 06.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DD74092 (PELNOMOCNIK RZADU) [X] 1,4-10,12 * column W * [A] 2,13,20; | [A]DE3709017 (LINDNER AG DECKEN-, BODEN-, TRENNWANDSYSTEME) [A] 1,5,8,9,11-16,20,21 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0309399 (ZURECON AG) [AD] 1,5-9,20 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE4001806 (STROER, GERHARD) [AD] 1,4,6,20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0641903 (MERO-WERKE DR.-ING. MAX MENGERINGHAUSEN GMBH & CO.) [A] 1,4,7,10,17-20 * figures 1,6; claims 1,12,13 *; | [AD]DE4001636 (MEISSL, GEB. GÖTTLERT, CHRISTINE ET AL.) [AD] 1-3,6,7,20 * the whole document * |