EP0827039 - Magenta toner for developing electrostatic images and process for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/09] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiba, Tatsuhiko Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/10] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/10] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115120.4 | 01.09.1997 | [1998/10] | Priority number, date | JP19960231551 | 02.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23155196 | [1998/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0827039 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827039 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0827039 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/09, G03G9/087 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/08795 (EP,US);
G03G9/092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1998/47] |
Former [1998/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Magenta-Toner zur Entwicklung elektrostatischer Bilder und Herstellungsverfahren | [1998/10] | English: | Magenta toner for developing electrostatic images and process for production thereof | [1998/10] | French: | Révélateur magenta pour le développement d'images électrostatiques et méthode de sa production | [1998/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/10] | 26.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 P.O. Box/Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.04.2002
ADMISSIBLE Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 P.O. Box/Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 13.06.2002 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.2002 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.09.2005 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.09.2005 | 28.09.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.11.2006 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.09.2007 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0247576 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-70 * page 4; examples 1,2 * * page 5; example 1 *; | [DA]US4777105 (MACHOLDT HANS-TOBIAS [DE], et al) [DA] 1-70 * abstract *; | [A]EP0362703 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1,36 * page 3, line 10 - line 25 * * claim 10 * * examples 9-11 * * page 6; example 1 *; | [A]EP0396086 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,36 * page 8 - page 9; table 1 * * page 20 - page 21; examples 1,2 *; | [A]EP0533172 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,36 * page 10; example 1 * * page 7, line 10 * |