EP0829309 - Ultrasound generating method for non-destructive testing and test apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lingenberg, Dieter Baeyerstrasse 2 65933 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Meier, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Tetzelweg 1 91058 Erlangen / DE | [1998/12] | Application number, filing date | 97115124.6 | 01.09.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | DE1996137424 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19637424 | [1998/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829309 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829309 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B06B1/04 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
B06B1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [2001/32] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Ultraschallwellen zur zerstörungsfreien Werkstoffprüfung und Prüfvorrichtung | [2001/02] | English: | Ultrasound generating method for non-destructive testing and test apparatus | [1998/12] | French: | Procédé de génération d'ultrason pour contrôle non-destructif et dispositif de contrôle | [1998/12] |
Former [1998/12] | Verfahren zum Erzeugen von Ultraschallwellen zur zerstörungsfreien Werkstoff-prüfung und Prüfvorrichtung | Examination procedure | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 23.05.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH, FR, GB, LI | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.07.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4127035 (VASILE CARMINE F) [X] 1 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 8 * * column 5, line 6 - line 16 *; | [X]US4471658 (MORIMOTO KAZUO [JP]) [X] 1,11 * column 1, line 4 - line 7 * * column 2, line 33 - column 3, line 48; figures 4,6 *; | [A]EP0451375 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5148414 (GRAFF ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5,11 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [DA]EP0579255 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [DA] 1,2,5,11 * page 4, column 5, line 45 - page 5, column 7, line 10 *; | [A]DE4301622 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,2,5,11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US4380931 (FROST HAROLD M, et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 15; figures 1,2; claim 1 * |