blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0828099

EP0828099 - Shift actuator for a change-speed gearbox [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2003  [2003/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/14]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
Daimler-Benz Aktiengesellschaft
Epplestrasse 225
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Stengel, Martin
Haubersbronner Strasse 83
73660 Urbach / DE
02 / Wörner, Günter
Falkenstrasse 15
71394 Kernen / DE
[1998/11]
Application number, filing date97115162.602.09.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateDE199613586604.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19635866
[1998/11]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0828099
Date:11.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0828099
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828099
Date:08.05.2002
Language:DE
[2002/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16H61/30
[1998/11]
CPC:
F16H61/28 (EP,US); F16H59/02 (KR); F16H61/30 (EP,KR,US);
F16H61/32 (EP,KR,US); F16H2059/026 (KR); F16H2063/3086 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T74/18592 (EP,US); Y10T74/18688 (EP,US); Y10T74/19251 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20024 (EP,US); Y10T74/2003 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/37]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schaltvorrichtung für ein Zahnräderwechselgetriebe[1998/11]
English:Shift actuator for a change-speed gearbox[1998/11]
French:Dispositif de commande d'une boîte de vitesses[1998/11]
Examination procedure30.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
21.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2002Fee for grant paid
07.02.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.02.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB08.05.2002
SE08.08.2002
[2003/17]
Former [2002/46]SE08.08.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2517456  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1,2,8 * figures 1-3 *;
 [DA]DE4137142  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.