EP0827893 - Toe angle adjustment mechanism for vehicle wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwanaga, Yoshihisa K.K. Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/11] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115260.8 | 03.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | JP19960234336 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23433696 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0827893 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0827893 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0827893 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B62D17/00, B60G7/00 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
B62D17/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorspureinstellvorrichtung für Fahrzeugräder | [1998/11] | English: | Toe angle adjustment mechanism for vehicle wheels | [1998/11] | French: | Dispositif d'ajustement de l'angle de parallélisme des roues d'un véhicule | [1998/11] | Examination procedure | 03.09.1997 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 16.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE964748 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 6 * page 2, line 85 - line 89; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2900196 (NIENKE ARTIE D) [A] 6 * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 10; figure - *; | [XY]US4162859 (MCAFEE LOYD O [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7 * column 6, line 1 - line 52; figures 1,3,4,9,10 * [Y] 2; | [A]US4875697 (MILLER ARDEN O [US]) [A] 3-7 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 24; figures 4-7 *; | [A]EP0497513 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 4* figure 3 *; | [XA]US5213435 (BROSZAT LOTHAR [DE]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 7; | [Y]DE4221169 (FENDT & CO XAVER [DE]) [Y] 2 * column 3, line 19 - line 34; figures 1,2 * |