EP0828156 - Oxygen sensor having a solid electrolyte applicable to an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/11] | Oxygen sensor having a solid elctrolyte applicable to an internal combustion engine | ||
[2013/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [2013/45] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Takashi c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | 02 /
Kato, Tomoyuki (Nee Kida) c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | 03 /
Hori, Makoto c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | 04 /
Hamaya, Masahiro c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | 05 /
Ota, Minoru c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | [2013/45] |
Former [1998/11] | 01 /
Kojima, Takashi c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | ||
02 /
Kato, Tomoyuki (Nee Kida) c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | |||
03 /
Hori, Makoto c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | |||
04 /
Hamaya, Masahiro c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | |||
05 /
Ota, Minoru c/o DENSO CORPORATION, 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1998/40] | R.A. KUHNEN & P.A. WACKER Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1998/11] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115269.9 | 03.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | JP19960255475 | 04.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25547596 | JP19970220895 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: JP 22089597 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828156 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828156 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828156 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/407 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
G01N27/4078 (EP,US);
G01N27/407 (EP,US);
G01N27/4077 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/05] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sauerstoffsensor mit einem Festelektrolyt für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2013/18] | English: | Oxygen sensor having a solid electrolyte applicable to an internal combustion engine | [2013/18] | French: | Capteur d'oxygène avec un électrolyte solide applicable à un moteur à combustion interne | [1998/11] |
Former [1998/11] | Sauerstoff mit einem Festelektrolyt für eine Brennkraftmaschine | ||
Former [1998/11] | Oxygen sensor having a solid elctrolyte applicable to an internal combustion engine | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2003 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4668477 (NISHIO HISAHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract ** column 5, line 6 - line 13; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0245717 (GEN SIGNAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 14 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]US4948491 (KATO NOBUHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - line 60; figure 1 * | Examination | GB2179157 |