blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0831003

EP0831003 - Linkage between vehicle bodies and bogie for a Jacobs-type bogie [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2005
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.12.2005  [2005/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bombardier Transportation GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
[2004/24]
Former [2001/15]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler Rail Systems GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
DaimlerChrysler AG
Epplestrasse 225
70567 Stuttgart / DE
Former [1998/30]For all designated states
ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Technology) GmbH
Saatwinkler Damm 43
13627 Berlin / DE
Former [1998/13]For all designated states
ABB Daimler-Benz Transportation (Deutschland) GmbH
Am Rathenaupark
16761 Hennigsdorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Bohms, Manfred
Paul-Schreier-Strasse 15
16761 Hennigsdorf / DE
02 / Fischer, Hermann
Schönwalder Strasse 9
16761 Hennigsdorf / DE
03 / Richter, Wolfgang-Dieter
Amselweg 8
90610 Winkelhaid / DE
04 / Trache, Peter
Luisenstrasse 24
16547 Birkenwerder / DE
05 / Willbrandt, Ralph
Erzberger Strasse 145
16515 Oranienburg / DE
[1998/13]
Representative(s)Thielmann, Andreas
Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Postfach 10 18 30
40009 Dusseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/46]Thielmann, Andreas
Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29
40435 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1998/13]Breiter, Achim, Dipl.-Ing.
Daimler-Benz AG, Intellectual Property Management, Sedanstrasse 10/Geb. 17
89077 Ulm / DE
Application number, filing date97115383.805.09.1997
[1998/13]
Priority number, dateDE199613876321.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19638763
[1998/13]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0831003
Date:25.03.1998
Language:DE
[1998/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0831003
Date:22.12.1999
[1999/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0831003
Date:29.12.2004
Language:DE
[2004/53]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:B61F3/12, B61G5/02
[1998/13]
CPC:
B61F3/125 (EP); B61G5/02 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/35]
Former [1998/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drehgestellanbindung für Jacobs-Drehgestelle[1998/13]
English:Linkage between vehicle bodies and bogie for a Jacobs-type bogie[1998/13]
French:Articulation entre les caisses des véhicules et bogie pour un bogie médian placé entre les caisses[1998/13]
Examination procedure01.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.10.2004Fee for grant paid
23.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
19.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200408   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3701424  (GUTEHOFFNUNGSHUETTE MAN [DE]) [A] 1,26 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 54; figure - *;
 [DA]EP0520301  (ABB HENSCHEL WAGGON UNION [DE]) [DA] 1,26* abstract *;
 [XA]DE4404878  (TALBOT WAGGONFAB [DE]) [X] 26 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 58; figure -; claims 1,2,5 * [A] 1
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.